EP4368461 - METHOD FOR MONITORING A MOTOR VEHICLE AND MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 P.O.Box 1770 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETTE, Bernd 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 23205458.5 | 24.10.2023 | [2024/20] | Priority number, date | DE202210211889 | 10.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022211889 | [2024/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4368461 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/31, G01S13/02, G01S13/931 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B60R25/31 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60R25/1004 (CN,US);
B60R21/015 (CN);
B60R25/01 (KR,US);
B60R25/1001 (KR);
B60R25/104 (CN,US);
G01S13/0209 (EP,KR);
G01S13/931 (EP);
G08B21/22 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2024/20] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING A MOTOR VEHICLE AND MOTOR VEHICLE | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004188164 (MAENO YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al); | [I]US2005068225 (INOUE HIROTO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016046105 (VALEO COMFORT & DRIVING ASSISTANCE [FR]); | [A]US10549722 (BILIK IGAL [IL], et al); | [A]US2020309932 (ZENG YUNZE [US], et al); | [A]US2020406860 (MAI CHAO-LUN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2014306799 | US2018154908 | DE102021207013 |