EP4364915 - ELECTRIC MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mafell AG Beffendorfer Strasse 4 78727 Oberndorf a.N. / DE | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daus, Felix 78655 Dunningen-Seedorf / DE | 02 /
Kessel, Wolfgang 78727 Oberndorf / DE | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 23205959.2 | 26.10.2023 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | DE202210129082 | 03.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022129082 | [2024/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364915 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4364915 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B27G19/04 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
B27G19/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE BEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE | [2024/19] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE TOOL | [2024/19] | French: | MACHINE D'USINAGE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/19] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 11.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010275450 (REFSON NEIL [GB]) |