EP4361365 - CONNECTOR FOR STEEL STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haoheng (Fujian) Building Materials Technology Co., Ltd. Guanshan Industrial Park / Wu'an Town Changtai Zhangzhou, Fujian 363999 / CN | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Yuchen Zhangzhou, Fujian 363999 / CN | 02 /
HONG, Qiuyao Zhangzhou, Fujian 363999 / CN | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Chung, Hoi Kan Mandarin IP Limited 7 Cherry Trees Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5XA / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23206008.7 | 26.10.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | CN202222824496U | 26.10.2022 Original published format: CN 202222824496 U | CN202222824506U | 26.10.2022 Original published format: CN 202222824506 U | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361365 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/58, // E04B1/24 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
E04B1/5825 (EP);
E04B1/2403 (EP,US);
E04B2001/2406 (EP,US);
E04B2001/2418 (EP);
E04B2001/2421 (EP);
E04B2001/2466 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER FÜR STAHLKONSTRUKTIONEN | [2024/18] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR STEEL STRUCTURES | [2024/18] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR STRUCTURES EN ACIER | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN105805112 (CHONGQING BIAOWANG MACHINERY EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [X]CN106284660 (ZHEJIANG PUTIAN INTEGRATED HOUSING CO LTD); | [XI]CN109930746 (UNIV NANJING FORESTRY, et al) | by applicant | CN114250860 |