EP4361443 - AXIALLY FLEXIBLE COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Lvneng New Energy Vehicle Parts Co., Ltd Building 1, No. 60, 21th Street, Baiyang Street Qiantang District Hangzhou City, Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GE, Dawei Hangzhou City, 310018 / CN | 02 /
OUYANG, Jun Hangzhou City, 310018 / CN | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23206109.3 | 26.10.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | CN202211331124 | 28.10.2022 Original published format: CN202211331124 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361443 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02, F04C23/00, F04C27/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP,CN,US);
F04C27/001 (EP,US);
F04C18/0253 (CN);
F04C23/008 (EP);
F04C27/00 (CN);
F04C27/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AXIAL FLEXIBLER VERDICHTER | [2024/18] | English: | AXIALLY FLEXIBLE COMPRESSOR | [2024/18] | French: | COMPRESSEUR AXIALEMENT FLEXIBLE | [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0404512 (SANDEN CORP [JP]); | [X]JPH1077977 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XI]CN112746957 (CHONGQING BIHAI YANGFAN INVEST CONSULTING CO LTD) |