EP4293150 - VISION-GUIDED STITCHING SYSTEMS AND LOGIC FOR FABRICATING ENGINEERED TEXTILES WITH INTERSTITCHED SUPERPOSED WIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDSTROM, Matthew D. Beaverton, 97005 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23206151.5 | 30.10.2020 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201962929499P | 01.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962929499 P | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4293150 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4293150 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/04, A43B23/02, D04H3/04, D04H3/045, D04H3/05, D04H3/115 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A43B1/04 (EP,CN);
D04H3/115 (EP,US);
A43B23/00 (US);
A43B23/0245 (EP,CN);
A43B23/025 (EP,CN,US);
A43B5/00 (CN);
D04H3/04 (EP);
D04H3/045 (EP);
D04H3/05 (EP);
D05B15/02 (CN);
D05B19/12 (CN);
D05B19/14 (CN,US);
A43B23/0205 (US);
A43B23/0265 (US);
A43D2200/10 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | D04H3/115 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHTGEFÜHRTE NÄHSYSTEME UND LOGIK ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MANIPULIERTEN TEXTILIEN MIT INEINANDERGEHEFTETEN ÜBERLAGERUNGSDRÄHTEN | [2023/51] | English: | VISION-GUIDED STITCHING SYSTEMS AND LOGIC FOR FABRICATING ENGINEERED TEXTILES WITH INTERSTITCHED SUPERPOSED WIRES | [2023/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE COUTURE GUIDÉS PAR VISION ET LOGIQUE DE FABRICATION DE TEXTILES TECHNIQUES AVEC DES FILS SUPERPOSÉS PIQUÉS ENSEMBLE | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 25.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20811214.4 / EP4051042 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3075277 (ADIDAS AG [DE]); | [A]DE202017103295U (OLCZEWSKI PETRA [DE]); | [A]US2018080155 (SANO TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP3549470 (ADIDAS AG [DE]) |