EP4290927 - BASE STATION, CORE NETWORK NODE FOR SESSION MANAGEMENT AND METHODS THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIVAVAKEESAR, Sivapathalingham Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
PATERSON, Robert Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
TAMURA, Toshiyuki Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Sadafuku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23206265.3 | 26.10.2017 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | GB20160018663 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: GB 201618663 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4290927 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4290927 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00, H04W36/00, // H04W76/19, H04W76/27 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04W68/005 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W36/0033 (GB,KR,RU);
H04W68/08 (GB,US);
H04W36/02 (KR);
H04W68/02 (KR);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BASISSTATION, KERNNETZWERKKNOTEN ZUR MOBILITÄTSVERWALTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/50] | English: | BASE STATION, CORE NETWORK NODE FOR SESSION MANAGEMENT AND METHODS THEREBY | [2023/50] | French: | STATION DE BASE, NOEUD DE RÉSEAU CENTRAL POUR LA GESTION DE MOBILITÉ ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17797769.1 / EP3536067 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | GB20160018663 |