EP4371397 - WINDROW PICK-UP WITH WINDGUARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATHMER, MIKE 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 23206448.5 | 27.10.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | DE202210130747 | 21.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022130747 | [2024/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371397 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01D89/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A01D89/008 (EP);
A01D89/004 (US);
A01D43/06 (EP);
A01F15/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWADAUFNEHMER MIT NIEDERHALTERN | [2024/21] | English: | WINDROW PICK-UP WITH WINDGUARDS | [2024/21] | French: | RAMASSEUR AVEC PINCES DE RETENUE | [2024/21] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1252814 (CLAAS USINES FRANCE [FR]); | [XD]EP1790206 (CLAAS FRANCE SAS [FR]); | [A]EP2674023 (CLAAS FRANCE SAS [FR]); | [AD]DE102012011591 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP4066624 (CNH IND BELGIUM NV [BE]) | by applicant | US2388212 | EP0401542 | EP0903077 | DE10120124 | DE10120204 | EP1790206 | DE102006001338 | DE102012011591 |