EP4376309 - ADVANCED DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM BETWEEN A SUPERVISOR AND A PATIENT, PARTICULARLY FOR EDUCATIONAL AND THERAPEUTIC ASPECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lombardo, Daniele Via Alcide De Gasperi, 4 95030 Sant'Agata li Battiati (CT) / IT | For all designated states Lombardo, Marco Via San Michele Arcangelo, 52 95030 Sant'Agata li Battiati (CT) / IT | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Bellomia, Paolo Bugnion S.p.A. Rome Office Via Sallustiana, 15 00187 Roma / IT | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23206499.8 | 27.10.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | IT20220024351 | 25.11.2022 Original published format: IT202200024351 | [2024/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376309 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, G16H20/30 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04B1/38 (EP);
G16H20/30 (EP);
G16H20/70 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWEITERTES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM ZWISCHEN EINEM SUPERVISOR UND EINEM PATIENTEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR AUSBILDUNGS- UND THERAPIEASPEKTE | [2024/22] | English: | ADVANCED DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM BETWEEN A SUPERVISOR AND A PATIENT, PARTICULARLY FOR EDUCATIONAL AND THERAPEUTIC ASPECTS | [2024/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES PERFECTIONNÉ ENTRE UN SUPERVISEUR ET UN PATIENT, NOTAMMENT POUR ASPECTS ÉDUCATIFS ET THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019108770 (FISCHER GREGORY S [US], et al); | [XYI]US10311645 (RAVINDRAN VIJAY [US], et al); | [I]US2021060790 (SEMSAR NEDA [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2021119766 (DOWN JOHN WILLIAM [AU], et al); |