EP4292560 - COUPLING DEVICES FOR SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medos International Sarl Chemin-Blanc 38 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDENMANN, Philippe 4436 Oberdorf / CH | 02 /
WEHRLI, Daniela 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23206962.5 | 30.05.2018 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201715609712 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US201715609712 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292560 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292560 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00, // A61B34/20, A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (US);
A61B17/1671 (US);
A61B17/3421 (EP,US);
A61B17/7074 (US);
A61B17/8819 (US);
A61B2017/00455 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2090/034 (EP,US);
A61B2090/363 (US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3979 (US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2023/51] | English: | COUPLING DEVICES FOR SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS AND RELATED METHODS | [2023/51] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE COUPLAGE POUR INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18728370.0 / EP3629985 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004054489 (MOCTEZUMA DE LA BARRERA JOSE L [DE], et al) [A] 7-9* para. 41;; figures 2-17 *; | [XA]WO2014003848 (GYRUS ACMI INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10 * para. 26-47;; figures 4-14 * [A] 7-9; | [XA]US2014371728 (VAUGHN TYRONE [US]) [X] 1,4 * para. 34- 63;; figures 1-9 * [A] 2,3,5-10 |