EP4292922 - AERIAL VEHICLE WITH DEPLOYABLE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anduril Industries, Inc. 1375 Sunflower Avenue Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEY, Nicholas Robert Kennesaw, 30144 / US | 02 /
STEELE, Joshua Lemming Kennesaw, 30144 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Jesse Owen Kennesaw, 30144 / US | 04 /
KUEHME, Daniel Kennesaw, 30144 / US | 05 /
PHILLIPS, Jonathan Caleb Kennesaw, 30144 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/51] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 23207184.5 | 21.04.2016 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201562254098P | 11.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562254098 P | US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: US201615092219 | US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: US201615092237 | US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: US201615092257 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292922 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292922 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/56, B64C1/36, B64C3/40, B64C3/54, B64C5/02, B64C5/12, B64C5/16, B64C11/28, B64C13/24, B64C13/30, B64C39/02, B64U20/40, B64U30/12, B64U50/13, B64U101/31 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
B64C3/54 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64C3/40 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64C1/36 (IL,US);
B64C11/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64C13/24 (IL,US);
B64C13/30 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64C3/546 (IL,US);
B64C3/56 (IL);
B64C39/024 (IL);
B64C5/02 (IL,US);
B64C5/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64C5/16 (IL,US);
B64U10/25 (IL);
B64U20/40 (EP,IL,KR);
B64U20/60 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64U30/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64U30/40 (IL);
B64U50/13 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64U50/19 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F16H7/02 (IL);
B64C2211/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64U2101/00 (IL);
B64U2101/30 (IL);
B64U2101/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | B64C3/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LUFTFAHRZEUG MIT AUSFAHRBAREN KOMPONENTEN | [2023/51] | English: | AERIAL VEHICLE WITH DEPLOYABLE COMPONENTS | [2023/51] | French: | VÉHICULE AÉRIEN À COMPOSANTS DÉPLOYABLES | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 24.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16864692.5 / EP3374260 | EP19170501.1 / EP3536607 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6056237 (WOODLAND RICHARD L K [CA]); | [A]US2009072094 (SANDERSON TERRY M [US], et al); | [X]US2009206193 (FILE DAVID J [US]); | [X]US2010148011 (SANDERSON TERRY M [US]); | [X]US2011001016 (SKILLEN ROBERT STEWART [US], et al) |