EP4360477 - AEROSOL-GENERATING ARTICLE, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR USE WITH A PLURALITY OF AEROSOL-FORMING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRONOV, Oleg 1588 Cudrefin / CH | 02 /
COURBAT, Jerome Christian 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
PATON, Michael Royston Hertfordshire, SG8 7DB / GB | 04 /
CROSS, David Letchworth Hertfordshire, SG6 2AR / GB | 05 /
STURA, Enrico 1607 Palézieux-Village / CH | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23207384.1 | 09.05.2018 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | EP20170170414 | 10.05.2017 Original published format: EP 17170414 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4360477 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4360477 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/30, A24F40/46, A24F40/465, A24F40/42, A24F40/50, // A24F40/10, A24F40/20 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
A24F40/30 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05B6/108 (KR,US);
A24B15/167 (CN);
A24F40/40 (CN);
A24F40/46 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/465 (EP,CN,US);
A24F40/50 (EP,US);
A24F40/57 (CN);
A61M11/042 (KR);
A61M15/06 (KR);
A24F40/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/18] | A24F40/30, A24F40/42, A24F40/46, A24F40/465, A24F40/50, // A24F40/10, A24F40/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | AEROSOLBILDENDER ARTIKEL, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT MEHREREN AEROSOLBILDENDEN SUBSTRATEN | [2024/18] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING ARTICLE, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR USE WITH A PLURALITY OF AEROSOL-FORMING SUBSTRATES | [2024/18] | French: | ARTICLE DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS AVEC UNE PLURALITÉ DE SUBSTRATS DE FORMATION D'AÉROSOL | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18724208.6 / EP3621465 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014166029 (WEIGENSBERG AARON ARYE [IL], et al); | [IY]CN203952405U (CHINA TOBACCO CHUANYU IND CO); | [I]WO2017001820 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]); | [XY]WO2017068098 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) | by applicant | US2015272225 |