EP4364575 - METHOD, DEVICE AND INSTALLATION FOR RIPENING CLIMACTERIC FRUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nature's Pride Honderdland 611 2676 LV Maasdijk / NL | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIND, Stephanus Leendert Jan 2565 MB DEN HAAG / NL | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 23207797.4 | 03.11.2023 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | NL20222033458 | 03.11.2022 Original published format: NL 2033458 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364575 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/152, G01N33/00, G01N33/02, G06Q10/08, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/02 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0832 (EP);
A23B7/152 (EP);
G06Q10/04 (EP);
G06Q30/0278 (EP);
G06Q50/02 (EP);
G01N33/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ANLAGE ZUM REIFEN KLIMAKTERISCHER FRÜCHTE | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND INSTALLATION FOR RIPENING CLIMACTERIC FRUITS | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET INSTALLATION POUR LA MATURATION DE FRUITS CLIMATÉRIQUES | [2024/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003150334 (GAEBLER RALPH [US]); | [Y]EP2134877 (EXPRESSIVE RES BV [NL]); | [X]WO2019096844 (MAERSK CONTAINER IND A/S [DK]); | [XDYI]EP3705888 (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN]); | by applicant | EP3705888 |