EP4372765 - BIO-ELECTRODE, BIO-ELECTRODE COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BIO-ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-1, Marunouchi 1 chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatakeyama, Jun Niigata / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Takayuki Niigata / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Joe Tokyo / JP | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 23208157.0 | 07.11.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | JP20220184475 | 17.11.2022 Original published format: JP 2022184475 | JP20230082859 | 19.05.2023 Original published format: JP 2023082859 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372765 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/12, A61B5/268 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H01B1/122 (EP);
A61B5/268 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y5/00 (US);
C08F20/38 (KR);
C08F212/30 (US);
C08G61/126 (KR);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/08 (KR);
C08L65/00 (KR);
A61B2562/0209 (KR);
A61B2562/0215 (US);
A61B2562/125 (EP,KR);
A61B2562/164 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOELEKTRODE, BIOELEKTRODENZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER BIOELEKTRODE | [2024/21] | English: | BIO-ELECTRODE, BIO-ELECTRODE COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BIO-ELECTRODE | [2024/21] | French: | BIO-ÉLECTRODE, COMPOSITION DE BIO-ÉLECTRODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BIO-ÉLECTRODE | [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP3067897 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]EP3995548 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | by applicant | WO2013039151 | JP2015100673 | JP6271378B | JP2018044147 | JP2018059050 | JP2018059052 | JP6335138B | JP2018130534 | JP6407107B | JP6438348B | JP6450661B | JP6483518B | JP6496258B | JP6661212B |