EP4309596 - CALIBRATED POWER-DRIVEN SURGICAL CUTTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectranetics LLC 9965 Federal Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80921 / US | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Weston H. Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SOTAK, Ryan Michael Eindhoven / NL | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23208223.0 | 27.03.2019 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | US201815942322 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US201815942322 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4309596 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4309596 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/32, A61B17/3205, A61N1/05 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/320758 (US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (US);
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00017 (US);
A61B2017/00039 (US);
A61B2017/00119 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (US);
A61B2017/00455 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/04] | A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERTE CHIRURGISCHE SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG MIT STROMANTRIEB | [2024/04] | English: | CALIBRATED POWER-DRIVEN SURGICAL CUTTING DEVICE | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE CHIRURGICAL ÉLECTRIQUE ÉTALONNÉ | [2024/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19716093.0 / EP3773239 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003125717 (WHITMAN MICHAEL P [US]); | [Y]US2009299141 (DOWNEY EARL C [US], et al); | [A]WO2014151814 (SPECTRANETICS CORP [US]); | [XY]US2015164530 (CARVER ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2016360947 (IIDA MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [XP]US2018221055 (GRACE KENNETH P [US], et al) | by applicant | US5651781 | US6167315 | US2003125717 | US2008154693 | US19900620587 | US19650621138 | US19770619473 | WO2014US26496 |