EP4368794 - BIOCLIMATIC POOL SHELTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZENCO GROUPE Zone Artisanale ou Zone d'activité de Masquère 31220 Cazeres / FR | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUTHE, CHRISTOPHE 31260 MONTSAUNES / FR | 02 /
RIVALS, JULIEN 11000 CARCASSONNE / FR | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 23208477.2 | 08.11.2023 | [2024/20] | Priority number, date | FR20220011675 | 09.11.2022 Original published format: FR 2211675 | [2024/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4368794 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/16, E06B9/26 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
E04H3/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOKLIMATISCHE SCHWIMMBECKENABDECKUNG | [2024/20] | English: | BIOCLIMATIC POOL SHELTER | [2024/20] | French: | ABRI DE PISCINE BIOCLIMATIQUE | [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3766691 (RAY G) [Y] 8,9 * column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 29 * * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 42; figures 1-4,7 * [A] 1,5,7; | [XY]DE3620285 (WEIKERT DIETRICH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 7, line 13 - column 9, line 40; figures 1-5 * * column 6, line 60 - line 66 * [Y] 8-10; | [A]NL1001184C (GERRIT PRINS [NL]) [A] 1,4* figure 9 *; | [A]AT3528U (ERNI HEDWIG [AT]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 20; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]FR2954789 (VILLARS JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [Y] 10 * page 6, line 20 - line 26; figures 1,3,4 * |