EP4296565 - LINEAR LED LIGHT SOURCE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flowil International Lighting (Holding) B.V. Prins Bernhardplein 200 1097 JB Amsterdam / NL | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOKER, James 3200 Aarschot / BE | 02 /
BROEDERS, Frank 3001 Heverlee / BE | 03 /
SCHAAF, Walter 3290 Diest / BE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB P.O. Box 860624 81633 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23208954.0 | 01.10.2018 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4296565 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4296565 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F21V31/00, F21V31/04, F21K9/90, F21K9/27, F21K9/272, // F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
F21K9/90 (EP,US);
F21V29/60 (US);
F21K9/27 (EP);
F21K9/272 (EP,US);
F21V31/005 (EP,US);
F21V31/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/52] | F21Y103/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LINEARE LED-LICHTQUELLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/52] | English: | LINEAR LED LIGHT SOURCE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2023/52] | French: | SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE À DEL LINÉAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 27.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18783407.2 / EP3861253 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2108880 (LIQUIDLEDS LIGHTING CORP [KY]) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] *; | [XI]EP2292970 (LIQUIDLEDS LIGHTING CORP [TW]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1, 2, 4, 9 * * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0014] - [0016] - [ 0020] , [ 0023] , [ 0024] , [ 0026] * * claims 1, 2 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]CN203656626U (ZHEJIANG LEDISON OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * figures 4-7 * * claims 1-7 * [I] 6; | [XI]EP3155314 (PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1, 6-8, 10-12 * * paragraphs [0034] , [ 0036] , [ 0044] , [ 0046] * [I] 5,6; | [A]US2017268730 (CAI DENGKE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 13A, 13B, 14A-14D ** paragraphs [0117] - [0140] *; | [A]JP2018078091 (MORIYAMA SANGYO KK) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 10] - [0012] - [0 15] , [0 18] - [0022] *; | [A]US2018216787 (CHUNG JIN WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 8A, 8B * * paragraphs [0067] - [0069] * | by applicant | US1498908 | US8400051 |