EP4382648 - YARN HEATER AND FALSE-TWIST TEXTURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMT Machinery, Inc. 6th Fl., Osaka Green Bldg. 2-6-26, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIMOTO, Takayuki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
KITAGAWA, Shigeki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 23209337.7 | 13.11.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | JP20220191392 | 30.11.2022 Original published format: JP 2022191392 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382648 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/02, D02J13/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
D02G1/0266 (EP,CN);
D02J13/00 (CN);
D02J13/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARNHEIZER UND FALSCHDRALLTEXTURIERMASCHINE | [2024/24] | English: | YARN HEATER AND FALSE-TWIST TEXTURING MACHINE | [2024/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE DE FIL ET MACHINE DE TEXTURATION PAR FAUSSE TORSION | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0905295 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2018007294 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | JP2002194631 |