EP4299300 - ARTICLES OF FOOTWEAR WITH RECYCLED PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRIS, Bryan N. Beaverton, 97005 / US | 02 /
MURPHY-REINHERTZ, Noah Beaverton, 97005 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23209608.1 | 29.05.2019 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | US201862678472P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678472 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4299300 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4299300 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/00, A43B1/12, A43B13/04, B29D35/12 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
B29D35/122 (EP,KR,US);
A43B1/0063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B1/0027 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B1/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B13/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29B11/08 (CN,KR);
B29B11/12 (CN,KR);
B29B17/0042 (CN,US);
B29B17/04 (CN,KR);
B29C39/023 (US);
B29C44/04 (KR,US);
B29C45/1634 (US);
B29C45/1679 (US);
B29C70/64 (US);
B29D35/0009 (KR,US);
B29D35/0054 (KR,US);
C08J9/105 (KR);
B29B2017/0468 (CN,KR);
B29C2037/0039 (US);
B29C2045/1698 (US);
B29L2031/504 (CN);
C08J11/06 (US);
C08J2300/30 (US);
C08J2309/00 (KR);
C08J2375/04 (KR);
C08J9/103 (US);
Y02P20/143 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | B29D35/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHUHARTIKEL MIT RECYCELTEM KUNSTSTOFF | [2024/01] | English: | ARTICLES OF FOOTWEAR WITH RECYCLED PLASTICS | [2024/01] | French: | ARTICLES CHAUSSANTS EN PLASTIQUE RECYCLÉ | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 12.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19730651.7 / EP3801100 | EP21189272.4 / EP3922122 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009042599 (AETREX WORLDWIDE INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2014066530 (SHEN XIAO [US], et al); | [XAY]US2014223673 (WARDLAW ANGUS [DE], et al) |