EP4375022 - ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIMIYA, Yuta Suwa-shi, Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Takayuki Suwa-shi, Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
YANO, Kazuhisa Suwa-shi, Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
TAMURA, Yosaku Suwa-shi, Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23210379.6 | 16.11.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | JP20220187719 | 24.11.2022 Original published format: JP 2022187719 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375022 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00, B25J9/04, B25J19/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B25J9/042 (EP,CN,US);
B25J9/0009 (EP,US);
B25J17/00 (US);
B25J18/00 (CN);
B25J19/00 (CN);
B25J19/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER | [2024/22] | English: | ROBOT | [2024/22] | French: | ROBOT | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2011093066 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD); | [XAI]CN202910858U (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | JP2011093066 | JP20220187719 |