blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4300230

EP4300230 - AUTOMATIC EXTRACTION OF ASSETS DATA FROM ENGINEERING DATA SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.12.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.12.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc.
70 Mechanic Street
Foxborough, Massachusetts 02035 / US
[2024/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KONDEJKAR, Sameer
411038 Pune / IN
02 / MUNUGOTI, Mallikarjuna
500090 Hyderabad / IN
03 / MCINTYRE, James P.
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
04 / LESUEUR, Grant
Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
 [2024/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2024/01]
Application number, filing date23210388.724.03.2020
[2024/01]
Priority number, dateUS201962823377P25.03.2019         Original published format: US 201962823377 P
US201962823469P25.03.2019         Original published format: US 201962823469 P
US201962842929P03.05.2019         Original published format: US 201962842929 P
[2024/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4300230
Date:03.01.2024
Language:EN
[2024/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4300230
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:G05B19/042
[2024/13]
CPC:
G05B19/0426 (EP,US); G06F30/12 (US); G05B17/02 (US);
G05B19/41885 (EP,US); G05B23/0221 (US); G05B23/0243 (US);
G05B23/027 (US); G05B23/0272 (US); G05B23/0281 (US);
G06F30/27 (US); G06N5/022 (US); G05B2219/23008 (US);
G05B2219/23067 (US); G05B2219/23272 (US); G05B2219/23278 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2024/01]G05B19/418
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/01]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE EXTRAKTION VON ANLAGENDATEN AUS TECHNISCHEN DATENQUELLEN[2024/01]
English:AUTOMATIC EXTRACTION OF ASSETS DATA FROM ENGINEERING DATA SOURCES[2024/01]
French:EXTRACTION AUTOMATIQUE DE DONNÉES D'ACTIFS À PARTIR DE SOURCES DE DONNÉES D'INGÉNIERIE[2024/01]
Examination procedure22.10.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
23.12.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2024Examination requested  [2025/05]
23.12.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP20719074.5  / EP3928168
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
23.12.2024Request for further processing filed
23.12.2024Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.01.2025Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
23.12.2024Request for further processing filed
23.12.2024Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.01.2025Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
23.12.2024Request for further processing filed
23.12.2024Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.01.2025Decision despatched
23.12.2024Request for further processing filed
23.12.2024Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.01.2025Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2019023982  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LTD [IE], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.