Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019001739 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020137413 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102376069B | Global Dossier | 17.03.2022 | B1 | KR20200020917 | 26.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020526114 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL271784 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2023 | B2 | IL271784 | 01.06.2023 | B1 | IL271784 | 27.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3635955 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2024 | B1 | EP3635955 | 15.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110832862B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | B | CN110832862 | 21.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3068596 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | C | CA3068596 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017421657B | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | B2 | AU2017421657 | 30.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4300967 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | A3 | EP4300967 | 03.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | EP17734332 | 30.06.2017 | EP23210579 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019028035 | 07.07.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ760682 | 24.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3635955T | 26.08.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | EP17734332 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201913273X | 30.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202000130 | 24.02.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP66340 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Earlier application | EP3635955 |