EP4300967 - ERROR RESILIENCE AND PARALLEL PROCESSING FOR DECODER SIDE MOTION VECTOR DERIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESENLIK, Semih 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
ZHAO, Zhijie 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
KOTRA, Anand Meher 80992 Munich / DE | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23210579.1 | 30.06.2017 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4300967 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4300967 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/513, H04N19/44, H04N19/436, H04N19/52, H04N19/56, H04N19/593 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,IL,KR);
H04N19/56 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/521 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/436 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,IL,KR);
H04N19/593 (EP,IL,KR)
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | H04N19/593 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | FEHLERROBUSTE UND PARALLELE VERARBEITUNG FÜR DECODERSEITIGE BEWEGUNGSVEKTORABLEITUNG | [2024/01] | English: | ERROR RESILIENCE AND PARALLEL PROCESSING FOR DECODER SIDE MOTION VECTOR DERIVATION | [2024/01] | French: | RÉSILIENCE D'ERREUR ET TRAITEMENT PARALLÈLE POUR DÉRIVATION DE VECTEUR DE MOUVEMENT CÔTÉ DÉCODEUR | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17734332.4 / EP3635955 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008117158 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]WO2012122927 (MEDIATEK INC [CN], et al); | [Y]EP2725800 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2016057420 (PANG CHAO [US], et al); | [A]WO2016057938 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); |