EP4300521 - TRANSFORMER HAVING REVERSE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLUM CO., LTD. A-tower 6 floor, 357 Guseong-ro Giheung-gu Gyeonggi-do Yongin-si 16914 / KR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Chang Yong 16691 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
RYU, Dong Kyun 05555 Seoul / KR | 03 /
BANG, Yun Sic 16049 Uiwang-si / KR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23210727.6 | 24.02.2022 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | KR20210026414 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210026414 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4300521 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4300521 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/32, H01F27/29 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01F27/325 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/292 (EP,US);
G09G3/36 (KR);
H01F17/04 (KR);
H01F27/24 (US);
H01F27/306 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | H01F27/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | TRANSFORMATOR MIT UMGEKEHRTER STRUKTUR | [2024/01] | English: | TRANSFORMER HAVING REVERSE STRUCTURE | [2024/01] | French: | TRANSFORMATEUR À STRUCTURE INVERSE | [2024/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22158391.7 / EP4057306 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012002387 (PARK GEUN YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0037] , [ 0052] , [ 0060] , [ 0065] , [ 0070] - [0085] - [ 0107] * * paragraphs [0114] , [ 0118] , [ 0120] * * figures 2 - 6 * [A] 3 [I] 6-10; | [A]US2012154089 (EOM JAE GEN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0009] , [ 0013] , [ 0014] , [ 0016] , [ 0017] , [ 0061] , [ 0100] * * paragraphs [0121 ] - [ 0128] * * figures 2, 5 *; | [A]US2012154363 (KIM DEUK HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0015 ] - [ 0019] - [ 0023] , [ 0026] ** figures 4 - 6 * | by applicant | JPH06112058 |