EP4372207 - BLADE OUTER AIR SEAL WITH LARGE RADIUS OF CURVATURE MOUNT HOOKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, Daniel S. Lyman, 04002 / US | 02 /
MICUCCI, Joseph Scarborough, 04074 / US | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/21] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 23210947.0 | 20.11.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | US202217990244 | 18.11.2022 Original published format: US202217990244 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372207 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D11/08, F01D25/24 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP);
F01D9/04 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/55 (US);
F05D2300/2261 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÄUSSERE LAUFSCHAUFELLUFTDICHTUNG MIT MONTAGEHAKEN MIT GROSSEM KRÜMMUNGSRADIUS | [2024/21] | English: | BLADE OUTER AIR SEAL WITH LARGE RADIUS OF CURVATURE MOUNT HOOKS | [2024/21] | French: | JOINT D'AIR EXTÉRIEUR D'AUBE AVEC DES CROCHETS DE MONTAGE À GRAND RAYON DE COURBURE | [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US6315519 (BAGEPALLI BHARAT SAMPATHKUMARA [US], et al); | [A]US2012082540 (DZIECH AARON [US], et al); | [Y]EP3106630 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US10808575 (TAXACHER GLENN CURTIS [US], et al) |