EP4345705 - ASSET MANAGEMENT IN A PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2024 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc. 70 Mechanic Street Foxborough, MA 02035 / US | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Peter G. North Carver, 02355 / US | 02 /
CUSWORTH, Trevor Westford, 01886 / US | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23211814.1 | 20.03.2016 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | US201514664511 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: US201514664511 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4345705 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4345705 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06313 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/51] |
Former [2024/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANLAGENVERWALTUNG IN EINEM PROZESSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/14] | English: | ASSET MANAGEMENT IN A PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM | [2024/14] | French: | GESTION D'ACTIFS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2024 | Examination requested [2024/51] | 11.11.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16161298.1 / EP3070656 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2025 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004153437 (BUCHAN JOHN GIBB [US]) |