EP4375094 - LOOSE SENSOR DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 200 Innovation Way Akron, OH 44316 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEST, Jeffrey McKay Uniontown 44685 / US | 02 /
CONSTANT, Michel Marguerite Walther Ghislain B6600 Bastogne / BE | 03 /
SUH, Peter Jung-min Copley 44321 / US | 04 /
BOLUIX, Dorian L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | 05 /
TRUFFO, Oliviero L-6195 Imbringen / LU | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23212104.6 | 24.11.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | US202263385073P | 28.11.2022 Original published format: US 202263385073 P | US202318504656 | 08.11.2023 Original published format: US202318504656 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375094 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, // B60C19/00, B60C23/06 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B60C23/0479 (EP);
G08B21/18 (US);
B60C23/0481 (EP,US);
G07C5/008 (US);
B60C19/00 (EP);
B60C2019/004 (EP);
B60C23/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG LOSER SENSOREN | [2024/22] | English: | LOOSE SENSOR DETECTION | [2024/22] | French: | DÉTECTION DE CAPTEUR LÂCHE | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2006028326 (HAAS THOMAS [DE]); | [Y]US2012173073 (HANNA JOERG [DE]) |