EP4307816 - RADIO NETWORK NODES, USER EQUIPMENT (UE) AND METHODS PERFORMED IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dudda, Torsten 41849 Wassenberg / DE | 02 /
Zou, Zhenhua 171 42 Solnå / SE | 03 /
Alabbasi, Abdulrahman 164 44 Kista / SE | 04 /
Enbuske, Henrik 113 41 Stockholm / SE | 05 /
Fröberg Olsson, Jonas 585 74 Ljungsbro / SE | 06 /
Schliwa-Bertling, Paul 585 71 Ljungsbro / SE | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23212286.1 | 27.09.2019 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | US201862737139P | 27.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862737139 P | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4307816 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4307816 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/566, // H04W72/23, H04W72/56 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04W72/569 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (US);
H04W72/1268 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2024/03] | H04W72/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | FUNKNETZWERKKNOTEN, BENUTZERGERÄT (UE) UND IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK DURCHGEFÜHRTE VERFAHREN | [2024/03] | English: | RADIO NETWORK NODES, USER EQUIPMENT (UE) AND METHODS PERFORMED IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2024/03] | French: | N UDS DE RÉSEAU RADIO, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) ET PROCÉDÉS MIS EN UVRE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19783757.8 / EP3858058 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "On UL Multiplexing for URLLC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, South Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180512), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1806813 ON UL MULTIPLEXING FOR URLLC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F93/Docs, (20180512), XP051462783 [X] 1-3,5-15 * the whole document * [I] 4 | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Prioritization between dynamic grant and configured grant", vol. RAN WG2, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20180122 - 20180126, (20180112), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1800586 PRIORITIZATION BETWEEN DYNAMIC GRANT AND CONFIGURED GRANT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOL, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5FAHs/2018%5F01%5FNR/Docs/, (20180112), XP051386236 [X] 1-3,5-15 * the whole document * [I] 4 |