Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4325814 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4325814



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 516
31.10.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.10.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
31.10.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.10.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 67
31.10.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 78
31.10.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
31.10.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.05.2024 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
03.04.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 4
03.04.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
03.04.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.03.2024 Search started Search / examination 1
24.01.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.01.2024 Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed Search / examination 1
13.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.12.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.12.2023 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 3
07.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 3
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
07.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
05.12.2023 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 Claims Search / examination 4
27.11.2023 Description Search / examination 76
27.11.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
27.11.2023 Drawings Search / examination 18
27.11.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
03.01.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 114
03.01.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 103