EP4379199 - HEATING DEVICE FOR HEATING A GAS FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Boysen GmbH & Co. KG Friedrich-Boysen-Strasse 14-17 72213 Altensteig / DE | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMST, Marvin 72459 Albstadt / DE | 02 /
HAAS, Andres 72290 Loßburg-Wittendorf / DE | 03 /
KORNHERR, Heinz 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 23212408.1 | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] | Priority number, date | DE202210131601 | 29.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022131601 | [2024/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379199 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
F01N3/2013 (EP,US);
F01N13/08 (CN);
F01N3/2803 (US);
H05B3/00 (CN);
F01N2240/16 (EP,CN,US);
F01N3/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZEINRICHTUNG ZUM BEHEIZEN EINES GASSTROMS | [2024/23] | English: | HEATING DEVICE FOR HEATING A GAS FLOW | [2024/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE POUR CHAUFFER UN COURANT DE GAZ | [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017192508 (MASDAR INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECH [AE], et al); | [Y]DE102020130657 (FAURECIA SYSTEMES DECHAPPEMENT [FR]); | [YA]WO2021176203 (DIESEKT3 LTD [GB]); | [XAY]US2022287155 (PANG SIMON HOCHING [US], et al) |