EP4379610 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, NODE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, CARRIER MEANS, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aizaki, Tomoyasu Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 23212470.1 | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] | Priority number, date | JP20220190207 | 29.11.2022 Original published format: JP 2022190207 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379610 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/098 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G06N3/098 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KNOTEN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, TRÄGERMITTEL UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/23] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, NODE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, CARRIER MEANS, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2024/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, NOEUD, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, MOYENS DE SUPPORT ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2024/23] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO2019146358 |