Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024165193 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916379446 | 09.04.2019 | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US202418420332 | 23.01.2024 | US202217831556 | 03.06.2022 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201715491613 | 19.04.2017 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | US201615198050 | 30.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023146264 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916379446 | 09.04.2019 | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US202217831556 | 03.06.2022 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201715491613 | 19.04.2017 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | US201615198050 | 30.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018000887 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201715491613 | 19.04.2017 | US201615198050 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9655945 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2017000844 | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201615198050 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11364277 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | B2 | US2019365848 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916379446 | 09.04.2019 | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201715491613 | 19.04.2017 | US201615198050 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023160839 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | JP2020115254 | 03.07.2020 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | JP2022107055 | 01.07.2022 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022136104 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | JP2020115254 | 03.07.2020 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3347032 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2023 | B1 | EP3347032 | 19.06.2019 | A4 | EP3347032 | 18.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016US40284 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106999539 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016US40284 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4338795 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2024 | A3 | EP4338795 | 20.03.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP16818751 | 30.06.2016 | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016US40284 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2971959T | 10.06.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016US40284 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1258611 | 15.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016US40284 | 30.06.2016 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017004317 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020172520 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018172440 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017014206 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562186638 | 30.06.2015 | US201562267510 | 15.12.2015 | US201662321558 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Earlier application | EP3347032 |