EP4338795 - TREATMENT OF ASCITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioVie Inc. 100 Cumming Center, Suite 247-C Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGELI, Paolo 35135 Padova / IT | 02 /
MARKHAM, Penelope Cliffton, VA 20124 / US | 03 /
ADAMS, Jonathan Chicago, IL 60605 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23212473.5 | 30.06.2016 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | US201562186638P | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562186638 P | US201562267510P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267510 P | US201662321558P | 12.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662321558 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4338795 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4338795 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/095, A61P1/16, A61P1/00 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
A61K38/095 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | A61P1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ASZITES | [2024/12] | English: | TREATMENT OF ASCITES | [2024/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'ASCITES | [2024/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16818751.6 / EP3347032 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |