EP4383543 - POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment Le Ponant 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILLONNET, Gaël 38054 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
OUKASSI, Sami 38054 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
PEREZ, Emeric 38054 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 04 /
MOURSY, Yasser 38054 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/24] | Thibon, Laurent Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 23212657.3 | 28.11.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | FR20220012739 | 05.12.2022 Original published format: FR 2212739 | [2024/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383543 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/07 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H02M3/07 (EP);
H02M3/156 (US);
H02M1/088 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSWANDLER | [2024/24] | English: | POWER CONVERTER | [2024/24] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2024/24] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 11.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013106380 (MARSILI STEFANO [AT], et al); | [XI]US2017207035 (GARDNER DONALD S [US], et al); | [I]US2019246223 (LARSEN DENNIS OLAND [DK], et al); |