EP4379162 - COVERING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pratic S.p.A. Via Angelo Tonutti, 80/90 33034 Fagagna (UD) / IT | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mindotti, Loris 33030 Pagnacco (UD) / IT | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 23213393.4 | 30.11.2023 | [2024/23] | Priority number, date | IT20220024630 | 30.11.2022 Original published format: IT202200024630 | [2024/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379162 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/10 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
E04F10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKVORRICHTUNG | [2024/23] | English: | COVERING APPARATUS | [2024/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE COUVERTURE | [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0119532 ; | [XI]EP1307621 (MANGEARD PHILIPPE [FR]); | [X]JP2017096090 (MIYABI:KK); | [A]CN111894405 (HE JINHUA) | by applicant | EP1307621 | JP2017096090 |