Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4309530 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4309530



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 259
15.04.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.04.2025 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.04.2025 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.04.2025 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.04.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.12.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.12.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.12.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.12.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.12.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
20.12.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 22
27.11.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.10.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.10.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
10.10.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
10.10.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 18
10.10.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
10.10.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.04.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.03.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
20.03.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 8
20.03.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
20.03.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.02.2024 Search started Search / examination 1
04.01.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.12.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.12.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
01.12.2023 Annex Search / examination 3
01.12.2023 Claims Search / examination 4
01.12.2023 Description Search / examination 17
01.12.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.12.2023 Drawings Search / examination 7
01.12.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
27.02.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 48
27.02.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45