EP4383342 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Kangoh 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sohyun 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
LEE, Dongjin 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
LIM, Junhee 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 23213815.6 | 01.12.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | KR20220170047 | 07.12.2022 Original published format: KR 20220170047 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4383342 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4383342 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/08, H10B41/10, H10B41/27, H10B41/40, H10B43/10, H10B43/27, H10B43/40, H01L21/8234 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H10B43/27 (EP,KR);
H10B41/40 (EP,KR);
H10B41/20 (CN);
H10B43/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L24/08 (US);
H01L25/0657 (US);
H01L25/18 (US);
H01L29/0847 (EP);
H10B41/10 (EP);
H10B41/27 (EP,KR);
H10B41/35 (CN);
H10B41/41 (CN,US);
H10B41/50 (KR);
H10B43/10 (EP);
H10B43/20 (CN);
H10B43/35 (CN);
H10B43/50 (KR);
H10B80/00 (US);
H01L21/823418 (EP);
H01L2224/08145 (US);
H01L2924/1431 (US);
H01L2924/14511 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM DAMIT | [2024/24] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME | [2024/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US10971502 (HUANG CHIEN-HUI [TW], et al); | [Y]US2022102306 (AHN JAE HO [KR], et al); | [Y]EP4036974 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |