EP4310235 - WASHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Seung Woo 06690 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kang, Da Nim 13920 Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Dong Min 15284 Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Joon Ho 07216 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kim, Bo Bin 04794 Seoul / KR | 06 /
Choi, Hyeok Jin 02487 Seoul / KR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23215161.3 | 17.11.2017 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | KR20170038442 | 27.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170038442 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4310235 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4310235 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D06F31/00, D06F34/28, D06F29/00, // D06F101/00, D06F105/50 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
D06F34/28 (EP,KR,US);
D06F31/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/30 (CN);
D06F29/00 (CN);
D06F34/04 (KR);
D06F34/08 (KR);
D06F34/10 (KR);
D06F34/20 (KR);
D06F2101/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/50 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/58 (KR);
D06F2105/62 (KR);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/04] | D06F29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASCHANLAGE | [2024/04] | English: | WASHING SYSTEM | [2024/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LAVAGE | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/33] | 11.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17902635.6 / EP3587650 | EP22150154.7 / EP4001490 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1882768 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP2065504 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]US2016215432 (KIM YOUNG-HYUN [KR]); | [A]WO2016141714 (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD [CN]) |