EP4332266 - COVETIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lyten, Inc. 145 Baytech Drive San Jose, CA 95134-2303 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOWELL, Michael W. San Jose, 95134-2303 / US | 02 /
LANNING, Bruce San Jose, 95134-2303 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Peter Todd San Jose, 95134-2303 / US | 04 /
COOK, Daniel San Jose, 95134-2303 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23215296.7 | 27.01.2020 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US201962797306P | 27.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962797306 P | US201962839995P | 29.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962839995 P | US201962868493P | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962868493 P | US201916460177 | 02.07.2019 Original published format: US201916460177 | US201962903649P | 20.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962903649 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4332266 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4332266 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/16, C22C1/05, C22C1/02, C22C1/10, C22C9/00, B22F3/115, B22F3/22, B23K35/02, B23K35/22, C22C1/04, C22C26/00, C23C4/04, C23C4/06, C23C4/134, B22F1/18, C22C1/055, C23C16/26, C23C16/40, C23C16/44, C23C16/513 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
B23K35/0255 (EP,US);
C22C1/055 (EP,KR);
B22F1/16 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/18 (EP,KR,US);
B22F3/115 (EP);
B23K35/0244 (EP);
B23K35/22 (EP);
C22C1/02 (EP);
C22C1/026 (KR);
C22C1/05 (EP);
C22C1/058 (KR);
C22C1/1036 (KR);
C22C26/00 (EP);
C22C9/00 (EP,KR);
C23C16/26 (EP);
C23C16/401 (EP);
C23C16/4417 (EP);
C23C16/513 (EP);
C23C4/04 (EP);
C23C4/06 (EP);
C23C4/134 (EP);
B22F2202/13 (EP);
B22F2207/01 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/115, B22F2202/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | C23C16/513 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOVETISCHE MATERIALIEN | [2024/10] | English: | COVETIC MATERIALS | [2024/10] | French: | MATÉRIAUX COVÉTIQUES | [2024/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20790948.2 / EP3914744 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018073110 (BALACHANDRAN UTHAMALINGAM [US], et al); | by applicant | US10332726 |