EP4390172 - HAND-HELD WORK DEVICE WITH A BRAKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Förster, Marcel 71409 Schwaikheim / DE | 02 /
Batista, Leonardo 71336 Waiblingen / DE | 03 /
Freund, Tobias 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 04 /
Angerbauer, Michael-Armin 71642 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23215496.3 | 11.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | DE20221013411 | 20.12.2022 Original published format: DE102022013411 | [2024/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390172 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16D49/08, F16D65/04, F16D69/02, F16D65/10 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
F16D65/04 (EP);
B27B17/083 (EP);
F16D49/08 (EP);
F16D65/10 (EP);
F16D69/02 (EP);
F16D2069/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTES ARBEITSGERÄT MIT EINER BREMSEINRICHTUNG | [2024/26] | English: | HAND-HELD WORK DEVICE WITH A BRAKING DEVICE | [2024/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAVAIL MANUEL DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2741340 (NEWELL GEORGE K); | [A]GB2413525 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AD]DE102013005287 (STIHL AG & CO KG ANDREAS [DE]); | [A]DE102013009955 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE3802488 | DE102013005287 |