blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4342666

EP4342666 - FLOOR COVERING WITH INTERLOCKING DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 64 Viken / SE
[2024/13]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Hao A.
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
02 / WHISPELL, John M.
Woodstown, NJ 08098 / US
 [2024/13]
Representative(s)Välinge Innovation AB
Patent Department
Prästavägen 513
263 64 Viken / SE
[2024/13]
Application number, filing date23215584.610.01.2011
[2024/13]
Priority number, dateUS201029383110P11.01.2010         Original published format: US 29383110 P
[2024/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4342666
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
ClassificationIPC:B32B3/06
[2024/13]
CPC:
E04F15/107 (EP,US); B32B3/06 (US); B32B5/024 (US);
B32B5/18 (US); B32B5/245 (US); B32B7/12 (US);
E04F15/02 (US); E04F15/02005 (US); E04F15/02016 (EP,US);
E04F15/02033 (EP,US); E04F15/02038 (EP,US); E04F15/0215 (US);
E04F15/102 (US); E04F15/105 (EP,US); B32B2255/02 (US);
B32B2266/0235 (US); B32B2419/04 (US); E04F2201/0153 (US);
E04F2201/0161 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/13]
TitleGerman:FUSSBODENBELAG MIT INEINANDERGREIFENDER AUSFÜHRUNG[2024/13]
English:FLOOR COVERING WITH INTERLOCKING DESIGN[2024/13]
French:REVÊTEMENT DE SOL À CONCEPTION D'INTERVERROUILLAGE[2024/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11732276.8  / EP2524090
EP22167416.1  / EP4092213
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 09
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 10
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 11
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 12
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 13
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 14
22.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 15
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantUS4172169
 US4180615
 US4187131
 US4313866
 US4333987
 US4393187
 US4423178
 US4426820
 US4507188
 US4614680
 US5112671
 US5380794
 US5458953
 US6291078
 US2006032175
 US2007022694
 US2007196624
 US2008138560
 US2009031662
 US2009223162
 US2009226662
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.