EP4366371 - IN-BAND WIRELESS RELAY OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto San Diego, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LIU, Le San Diego, 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Wanshi San Diego, 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
MONTOJO, Juan San Diego, 92121-1714 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 23215986.3 | 02.06.2020 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | US201962856509P | 03.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962856509 P | US202016889665 | 01.06.2020 Original published format: US202016889665 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4366371 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4366371 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04W16/26, H04W84/04, H04W24/10 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H04W84/047 (EP,CN);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04B7/15528 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/10 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/14 (EP,CN);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W8/24 (US);
H04W80/02 (US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP);
H04W88/04 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/19] | H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | BANDINTERNE DRAHTLOSE RELAISOPERATIONEN | [2024/19] | English: | IN-BAND WIRELESS RELAY OPERATIONS | [2024/19] | French: | OPÉRATIONS DE RELAIS SANS FIL EN BANDE | [2024/19] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20746485.0 / EP3977640 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2017374575 (KAHTAVA JUSSI TAPANI [GB], et al); | [A]US2019053087 (CALLENDER CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) |