EP4324472 - NOVEL PEPTIDES AND COMBINATION OF PEPTIDES FOR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST PROSTATE CANCER AND OTHER CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states immatics biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahr, Andrea 72076 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
Weinschenk, Toni 73773 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
Schoor, Oliver 72074 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
Fritsche, Jens 72144 Dusslingen / DE | 05 /
Singh, Harpreet 80804 Munich / DE | 06 /
Müller, Phillip 34117 Kassel / DE | 07 /
Leibold, Julia 6336 Langkampfen / AT | 08 /
Goldfinger, Valentina 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23216403.8 | 05.08.2016 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US201562201289P | 05.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562201289 P | GB20150013921 | 06.08.2015 Original published format: GB 201513921 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4324472 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4324472 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K14/47, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C07K14/725, A61K38/00, C12N9/64, C12N5/0783, C12N5/0784 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K14/47 (IL,US);
C07K16/30 (IL,KR,US);
C07K7/08 (CN,KR);
C12N15/115 (IL,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (CN,KR);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0639 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N9/6445 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/6886 (IL,KR,US);
G01N33/57407 (IL,KR,US);
G01N33/5748 (IL,KR,US);
G01N33/6848 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/5158 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/572 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2510/00 (CN,KR);
C12N2800/107 (CN,KR);
C12Q2600/106 (IL,KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (IL,KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (IL,KR,US);
C12Q2600/16 (IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Extension states | BA | 13.12.2023 | ME | 13.12.2023 | Validation states | MA | 13.12.2023 | MD | 13.12.2023 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE PEPTIDE UND KOMBINATION AUS PEPTIDEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER IMMUNTHERAPIE GEGEN PROSTATAKREBS UND ANDERE KREBSARTEN | [2024/08] | English: | NOVEL PEPTIDES AND COMBINATION OF PEPTIDES FOR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST PROSTATE CANCER AND OTHER CANCERS | [2024/08] | French: | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES ET COMBINAISON DE PEPTIDES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS EN IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE CONTRE LE CANCER DE LA PROSTATE ET D'AUTRES CANCERS | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16750766.4 / EP3331900 | EP20216899.3 / EP3854801 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012079878 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [E]WO2017089772 (IMMUNOCORE LTD [GB], et al); | by applicant | US4342566 | US4440859 | US4530901 | US4582800 | US4677063 | US4678751 | US4704362 | US4710463 | US4757006 | US4766075 | US4810648 | US4816567 | US4897445 | WO9429348 | WO9518145 | WO9726328 | US5849589 | WO0172768 | US6406705 | WO03068201 | WO03070752 | WO2004033685 | WO2004074322 | WO2004084798 | WO2007028574 | EP1760088 | EP2112253 | US2010113300 | WO2012056407 | US2013096016 | WO2013057586 | US2013115191 | WO2014071978 | WO2014191359 |