EP4390329 - ENCODER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McADAM, Simon Eliot Wotton-under-Edge, GL12 8JR / GB | 02 /
BALE, Richard James Wotton-under-Edge, GL12 8JR / GB | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Rolfe, Edward William, et al Patent Department Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23217080.3 | 15.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | EP20220275164 | 20.12.2022 Original published format: EP 22275164 | EP20220275165 | 20.12.2022 Original published format: EP 22275165 | EP20220275166 | 20.12.2022 Original published format: EP 22275166 | EP20220275167 | 21.12.2022 Original published format: EP 22275167 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390329 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/34, G01D5/38, G03F7/00 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G01D5/38 (EP);
G01D5/345 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KODIERGERÄT | [2024/26] | English: | ENCODER APPARATUS | [2024/26] | French: | APPAREIL CODEUR | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016231143 (MCADAM SIMON ELIOT [GB]); | [A]US2016238415 (MCADAM SIMON ELIOT [GB]); | [A]US2016245673 (MCADAM SIMON ELIOT [GB]); | [A]WO2017042570 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]); | [A]US2022026243 (HOWLEY COLIN KEITH [GB], et al) | by applicant | WO0742570 | US5279044 | WO02065061 | WO02084223 | WO2005124282 | US7499827 | WO2010116145 | WO2017042570 | US10989567 |