EP4317641 - ARRANGEMENT FOR GUIDING A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖTZ, Christof 6890 Lustenau / AT | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23217116.5 | 05.11.2019 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | AT20180050974 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: AT 509742018 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4317641 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4317641 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/26, E05D15/58 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
E05D15/58 (EP,AT,US);
E05D15/264 (EP,US);
E06B3/5045 (AT,US);
E05Y2201/236 (EP);
E05Y2201/474 (EP);
E05Y2201/62 (EP);
E05Y2201/654 (EP,AT);
E05Y2201/672 (EP);
E05Y2600/11 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | E05D15/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES BEWEGBAREN MÖBELTEILS | [2024/06] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR GUIDING A MOVABLE FURNITURE PART | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE D'UNE PARTIE DE MEUBLE MOBILE | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 23.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19805116.1 / EP3880925 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5078461 (BECK ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]EP1253274 (HETTICH HEINZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]JP4963137B ; | [AD]WO2018129568 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) | by applicant | WO2018129568 |