EP4380147 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR USE OF COMPACT CONCURRENT CODECS IN MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUNG, Nikolai Konrad San Diego / US | 02 /
WANG, Yekui San Diego / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Ramachandran San Diego / US | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/23] | Ainscow, Georgina Frances Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 23217173.6 | 19.07.2017 | [2024/23] | Priority number, date | US201662365348P | 21.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662365348 P | US201662381559P | 30.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662381559 P | US201715652946 | 18.07.2017 Original published format: US201715652946 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4380147 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04N7/15 (EP,US);
H04L65/756 (KR);
H04L65/1069 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1101 (KR,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP);
H04L65/403 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/65 (KR,US);
H04L65/70 (US);
H04L67/141 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/152 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG VON KOMPAKTEN GLEICHZEITIGEN CODECS IN DER MULTIMEDIA- KOMMUNIKATION | [2024/23] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR USE OF COMPACT CONCURRENT CODECS IN MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS | [2024/23] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR L'UTILISATION DE CODECS CONCURRENTS COMPACTS DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS MULTIMEDIA | [2024/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17754212.3 / EP3488605 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006019380 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al); | [A]US2006168637 (VYSOTSKY VLADIMIR [US], et al); |