EP4395175 - CIRCUIT TO REDUCE GATE INDUCED DRAIN LEAKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goyal, Saurabh 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Thakur, Krishna 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 23217504.2 | 18.12.2023 | [2024/27] | Priority number, date | IN202221074458 | 22.12.2022 Original published format: IN202221074458 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395175 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/06, G11C27/02 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H03K17/063 (EP);
H03K17/161 (US);
G11C27/024 (EP);
H03K2217/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON GATE-INDUZIERTEM DRAIN-LECKSTROM | [2024/27] | English: | CIRCUIT TO REDUCE GATE INDUCED DRAIN LEAKAGE | [2024/27] | French: | CIRCUIT POUR RÉDUIRE LES FUITES DE DRAIN INDUITES PAR LA GRILLE | [2024/27] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2019051367 (ELSAYED MOHAMED M [US]); | [XA]EP3758227 (NXP USA INC [US]); | [A]US11190178 (COLLINS DIARMUID [IE], et al) |