EP4316382 - INTERFACE DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MULTIMODAL PROBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lightlab Imaging, Inc. One Technology Park Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINS, Christopher Londonderry, NH 03053 / US | 02 /
ATLAS, Michael Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
SHIP, Alexander Needham, MA 02492 / US | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23218841.7 | 04.02.2013 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | US201261728006P | 19.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261728006 P | US201261727997P | 19.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261727997 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4316382 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4316382 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/14, A61B5/00, A61B8/12 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
A61B8/4416 (EP,US);
A61B5/0035 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | A61B8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR MULTIMODALE SONDEN | [2024/06] | English: | INTERFACE DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MULTIMODAL PROBES | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'INTERFACE, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SONDES MULTIMODALES | [2024/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13855462.1 / EP2919658 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008057573 (LIGHTLAB IMAGING INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2009137659 (INFRAREDX INC [US], et al); | [A]EP2484288 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) |