EP4394654 - INTELLIGENT LOGISTICS VEHICLE FOR DETECTING ASSET LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Parcel Service Of America, Inc. 55 Glenlake Parkway N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONAFE, Jethro Atlanta, GA / US | 02 /
AZAR, Christopher Atlanta, GA / US | 03 /
BAUTISTA, Dennis Atlanta, GA / US | 04 /
PIZZUTO, Vincent Atlanta, GA / US | 05 /
UBER, Derek Atlanta, GA / US | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 23219274.0 | 21.12.2023 | [2024/27] | Priority number, date | US202218089925 | 28.12.2022 Original published format: US202218089925 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4394654 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G06K7/10128 (EP);
G06K17/0029 (CN);
G06K7/10099 (US);
G06K19/0723 (US);
G06K19/07705 (US);
G06Q10/083 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES LOGISTIKFAHRZEUG ZUR ERKENNUNG DES STANDORTS VON VERMÖGENSWERTEN | [2024/27] | English: | INTELLIGENT LOGISTICS VEHICLE FOR DETECTING ASSET LOCATION | [2024/27] | French: | VÉHICULE LOGISTIQUE INTELLIGENT POUR DÉTECTER LA LOCALISATION D'ACTIFS | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2008266092 (CAMPERO RICHARD J [US], et al); | [XI]US2022207473 (FREEMAN MALLORY [US], et al) |