EP4327663 - STRUCTURING FATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Observations by third parties | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Upfield Europe B.V. Beethovenstraat 551 7th floor 1083 HK Amsterdam / NL | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOL, Georg Christian 1083 HK AMSTERDAM / NL | 02 /
POTMAN, Ronald Peter 1083 HK AMSTERDAM / NL | 03 /
SMIT-KINGMA, Irene Erica 1083 HK AMSTERDAM / NL | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23219317.7 | 26.01.2022 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | EP20210153504 | 26.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21153504 | [2024/09] | Previously filed application, date | WO2022EP51806 | 26.01.2022 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4327663 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4327663 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, C11C3/10 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A23D7/003 (EP,US);
C11C3/10 (EP,CN,US);
A23D7/04 (CN,US);
A23D7/001 (EP,US);
A23D7/0056 (CN);
C11C3/08 (CN);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/20, A23V2250/1886, A23V2250/194, A23V2300/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | STRUKTURIERUNG VON FETTEN | [2024/09] | English: | STRUCTURING FATS | [2024/09] | French: | STRUCTURATION DE GRAISSES | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22702680.4 / EP4284180 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005071053 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [E]WO2022038290 (UPFIELD EUROPE BV [NL]); | by applicant | EP0078568 | EP0652289 | other | WO2019185444 | WO2022038290 | WO2022162026 |