EP4404627 - SMF, AMF AND UPF RELOCATION DURING UE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ofinno, LLC 1950 Opportunity Way, Suite 1200 Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2024/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Weihua Reston, 20190 / US | 02 /
DINAN, Esmael Reston, 20190 / US | 03 /
PARK, Kyungmin Reston, 20190 / US | 04 /
TALEBI FARD, Peyman Reston, 20190 / US | [2024/30] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2024/30] | Application number, filing date | 23219641.0 | 28.09.2018 | [2024/30] | Priority number, date | US201762564323P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564323 P | [2024/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4404627 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/10, H04W36/38, // H04W76/32 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H04W36/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/0033 (US);
H04W36/38 (EP,US);
H04W76/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] | Title | German: | SMF-, AMF- UND UPF-RELOKALISIERUNG WÄHREND DER REGISTRIERUNG EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS | [2024/30] | English: | SMF, AMF AND UPF RELOCATION DURING UE REGISTRATION | [2024/30] | French: | RELOCALISATION SMF, AMF ET UPF PENDANT UN ENREGISTREMENT D'UE | [2024/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18792667.0 / EP3673682 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |